HI SB944 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 156, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 156, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of the Attorney General to convene a task force to recommend amendments to update existing parentage laws that reflect outdated concepts of families, parenthood, conception and gestation, and parental rights. Requires an interim and final report to the Legislature. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Parentage Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Act 156, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2023-06-30 | House | Act 156, on 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and none excused (0). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 57) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 57). |
2023-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-23 4:15PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 838). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2023-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Elefante, San Buenaventura. |
2023-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2023-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-31 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-03-23. |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1869) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan. |
2023-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-03-22 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-22-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-22-23. |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-17-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 315) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 804) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB665 (Same As) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 2