HI SB974 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB974
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the county vehicle weight tax exemption for active duty military personnel who are stationed at a military installation or assigned active military duty in the State as of January 1, 2022. Expands the county vehicle weight tax exemption to include spouses of Hawaii National Guard or military reserves members who claim Hawaii as their residence of record and disabled veterans. Increases the total number of vehicles that are qualified for the weight tax exemption under certain conditions.
Title
Relating To Vehicle Weight Tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB974 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRS/PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Counties
Disability
Exemption
Hawaii National Guard
Military
Military Reserves
Spouses
Vehicle Weight Tax
Veteran
Disability
Exemption
Hawaii National Guard
Military
Military Reserves
Spouses
Vehicle Weight Tax
Veteran
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=974&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB974_.HTM |