HI SCR118 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR118
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Support And Fund The Scientific Study Of Firearms Violence And Prevention.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Support And Fund The Scientific Study Of Firearms Violence And Prevention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3235), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR118 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Referred to HWN/TRE/PSM, WAM.
HCR133 (Same As) 2018-03-29 - Referred to PSM/JDC.
HCR133 (Same As) 2018-03-29 - Referred to PSM/JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=118&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR118_.HTM |