HI SCR123 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 67
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 67
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Naturopathic Medicine To Adopt Rules Consistent With Act 22, Special Session Laws Of Hawaii 2009, To Allow Naturopathic Physicians To Perform Parenteral Therapy.
Title
Naturopathic Medicine; Parenteral Therapy; Administrative Rules
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 67 | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 550) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-09-10. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3091) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Green ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Ihara, Sakamoto. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-07-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2927), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to CPN. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 03-19-10 2:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-10 2:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR53 (Same As) 2010-04-09 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2).