HI SCR147 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-01 - (H) Referred to AGR/EDN, LMG, referral sheet 58
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-01 - (H) Referred to AGR/EDN, LMG, referral sheet 58
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Convening A Working Group To Examine Farm To School Models.
Title
Farm to School Pilot Program; Working Group; 2011 Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | (H) Referred to AGR/EDN, LMG, referral sheet 58 | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 366) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) One Day Notice 03-30-10. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) Reported from EDT/EDH/WTL/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2882) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 03-22-10 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Hee, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Baker, Kokubun, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Sakamoto, Takamine, Taniguchi. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Fukunaga, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Takamine, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/EDH/WTL/HRE has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-19-10 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/EDH/WTL/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDT/EDH/WTL/HRE. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR67 (Same As) 2010-03-30 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).