HI SCR155 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR155
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Study On The Benefits Of Establishing A Sugar-sweetened Beverage Surcharge Program To Fund Public Health Programs In The State.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Study On The Benefits Of Establishing A Sugar-sweetened Beverage Surcharge Program To Fund Public Health Programs In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1216), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR155 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HCR128 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30
HCR128 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30