HI SCR215 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR215
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii To Investigate And Address The Feasibility And Accessibility Of Developing And Implementing A Nursing Program At Honolulu Community College.
Title
Requesting The University Of Hawaii To Investigate And Address The Feasibility And Accessibility Of Developing And Implementing A Nursing Program At Honolulu Community College.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-05-09 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 956). |
2022-05-09 | House | Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 956). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-26-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2022-04-26 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 916). |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 791). |
2022-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-04-19 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-19-22. |
2022-04-25 | House | Re-referred to AGR/HHH, referral sheet 52 |
2022-04-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on HET as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3). |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported from AGR/HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2072-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to HET. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Kapela; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Matayoshi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Marten, Tokioka, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/HHH on Wednesday, 04-13-22 11:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to AGR/HHH, HET, referral sheet 45 |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 642) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3645) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Wakai. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HRE. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR215 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR120 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, HET, referral sheet 27
SR208 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR120 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, HET, referral sheet 27
SR208 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.