HI SCR219 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR219
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA/HMS.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA/HMS.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting State And County Agencies To Implement Employment First Principles In Hiring Practices And All Programs And Services Administered Or Funded By The State And Counties, Including Programs And Services That Help Persons With Disabilities Obtain Employment.
Title
Requesting State And County Agencies To Implement Employment First Principles In Hiring Practices And All Programs And Services Administered Or Funded By The State And Counties, Including Programs And Services That Help Persons With Disabilities Obtain Employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to LCA/HMS. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR219 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR72 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to LAT, HHH, referral sheet 27
SR212 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA/HMS.
HCR72 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to LAT, HHH, referral sheet 27
SR212 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA/HMS.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=219&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SCR219_.HTM |