HI SCR221 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 60
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 60
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the Department of Education establish a task force for the development of a program for the education and training of high school coaches, assistant coaches, trainers, and athletic department personnel for the prevention, avoidance, and minimization of injuries to high school athletes.
Title
Requesting the Department of Education establish a task force for the development of a program for the education and training of high school coaches, assistant coaches, trainers, and athletic department personnel for the prevention, avoidance, and minimization of injuries to high school athletes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 60 | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 374) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) One Day Notice 03-31-10. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2898) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 03-24-10 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 03-22-10 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-10 1:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) Referred to EDH. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR112 (Same As) 2010-03-15 - (S) Referred to EDH.