HI SCR36 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - (H) Re-referred to HED/ERB, FIN, referral sheet 72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - (H) Re-referred to HED/ERB, FIN, referral sheet 72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Development Of A Plan To Examine The Long-term Uses Of The Hawaii Film Studio Diamond Head Campus.
Title
Hawaii Film Studio; Long-Term Use Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | (H) Re-referred to HED/ERB, FIN, referral sheet 72 | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on WLO with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1). | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Reported from HED/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1791-12), recommending referral to WLO. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Pine. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Awana, Chang, Hanohano, Takai, Takumi, Wooley, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno, Saiki, Ching. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HED/ERB on Thursday, 04-19-12 3:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to HED/ERB, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 694) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3395) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from EDT/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3120), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Solomon. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-30-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 03-30-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-12 2:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT/EDU, WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Referred to EDT/EDU, TSM, WAM. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) Offered. |