HI SCR37 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR37
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Survey And Report On Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Instruction Being Offered Throughout State Departments.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Survey And Report On Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Instruction Being Offered Throughout State Departments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 495) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1393) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to HTH. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR37 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
SR26 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR26 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.