HI SCR37 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR37
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing Support For The Naming Of A United States Navy Surface Combatant Ship After Fireman Second Class And Congressional Medal Of Honor Recipient Telesforo Trinidad.
Title
Expressing Support For The Naming Of A United States Navy Surface Combatant Ship After Fireman Second Class And Congressional Medal Of Honor Recipient Telesforo Trinidad.
Sponsors
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2034-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-04-12 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Thursday, 04-14-22 10:15AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 44 |
2022-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 593) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-22. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3586) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR37 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
HCR57 (Same As) 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SR32 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR57 (Same As) 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SR32 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.