HI SCR46 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Endorsing And Supporting The Ala Wai Watershed Partnership And Requesting A Report On Progress Made By The Partnership.
Title
Endorsing and supporting the Ala Wai watershed partnership.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3197), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=46&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SCR46_.HTM |