HI SCR6 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to WLO, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 67
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to WLO, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 67
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Cancellation Of The Lease Of Non-exclusive Easement S-5252 And The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands Situated At Lapaakea, Lahaina, Maui, Identified By Tax Map Key: (2) 4-5-001:055: Seaward Of Tax Map Key: (2) 45001:006; And Urging The Department Of Education To Continue The Lahainaluna High School Boarding Program.
Title
BLNR; Non-Exclusive Easement; Lahainaluna Boarding Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | (H) Referred to WLO, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 67 | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 539) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3093) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee, Hooser. | |
2010-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Report adopted, referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2693), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Bunda, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Fukunaga, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-10 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Offered. |