HI SCR6 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Referred to HLT/HED, FIN, referral sheet 58
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Referred to HLT/HED, FIN, referral sheet 58
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The John A. Burns School Of Medicine And The School Of Nursing And Dental Hygiene Of The University Of Hawaii To Include Breastfeeding In Educational Curriculum To Educate Medical Professionals To Advocate And Promote Breastfeeding Among Expectant Mothers.
Title
Breastfeeding; Inclusion in Medical and Nursing Curriculum at University of Hawaii
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | (H) Referred to HLT/HED, FIN, referral sheet 58 | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 416) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from HTH/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1191) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Shimabukuro, Wakai. | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-11 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) The public hearing scheduled on 03-11-11 at 3:15PM in conference room 229 has been cancelled. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-11 3:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Referred to HTH/EDU. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Offered. |