HI SCR6 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR6
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Convening A Task Force To Address Implementation Of Hawaii's State Law Corollary To Title Ix In Light Of Anticipated Changes To Federal Title Ix Regulations.
Title
Convening A Task Force To Address Implementation Of Hawaii's State Law Corollary To Title Ix In Light Of Anticipated Changes To Federal Title Ix Regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HRE, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR6 (Carry Over) 2019-03-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
HCR15 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
HCR15 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=6&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR6_.HTM |