HI SCR60 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR60
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Hawaiian Home Lands Trust Beneficiaries By Affirming Their Right To Require The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands, Department Of Land And Natural Resources, And Department Of Transportation To Come To A Resolution And Fair Compensation For Past, Present, And Future Use Of The Land Beneath The Mauna Kea Access Road And Other Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands Parcels In The Surrounding Area.
Title
Supporting The Hawaiian Home Lands Trust Beneficiaries By Affirming Their Right To Require The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands, Department Of Land And Natural Resources, And Department Of Transportation To Come To A Resolution And Fair Compensation For Past, Present, And Future Use Of The Land Beneath The Mauna Kea Access Road And Other Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands Parcels In The Surrounding Area.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3658), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR60 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 50