HI SCR72 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR72
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to ECD, CPC, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to ECD, CPC, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development And Tourism To Establish A Working Group To Develop Funding Sources For Rural Broadband Improvements.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development And Tourism To Establish A Working Group To Develop Funding Sources For Rural Broadband Improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 509) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1296) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-21 10:00AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR72 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to ECD, CPC, referral sheet 32
SR54 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR54 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.