HI SCR74 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR74
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Papa Ola Lokahi To Assess The Impact On Social, Financial, And Cultural Integrity Of Providing Health Coverage For Certain Native Hawaiian Culture-based Activities.
Title
Requesting Papa Ola Lokahi To Assess The Impact On Social, Financial, And Cultural Integrity Of Providing Health Coverage For Certain Native Hawaiian Culture-based Activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2018-04-17 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-17 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Say excused (2). |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2053-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Creagan, Gates, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Say. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 04-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-10 | House | Re-referred to OMH, referral sheet 55 |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to OMH/HHS, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 514) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HWN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3397) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Nishihara. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, English, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to HWN/CPH. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR74 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HCR69 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to HHS/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR69 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to HHS/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 39