HI SCR75 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR75
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Referred to WAL/EEP, CPC, referral sheet 42
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Referred to WAL/EEP, CPC, referral sheet 42
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Prioritize Enforcement Of Water Pollution Regulations In Areas Where There Have Been Reports Of Runoff And Other Forms Of Water Pollution On Molokai.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Prioritize Enforcement Of Water Pollution Regulations In Areas Where There Have Been Reports Of Runoff And Other Forms Of Water Pollution On Molokai.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, CPC, referral sheet 42 |
2022-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 562). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-22. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HTH/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3533) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, San Buenaventura. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HTH/AEN. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR75 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32
SR68 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR68 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.