HI SCR9 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR9
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Convening A Task Force To Address Implementation Of Hawaii's State Law Corollary To Title Ix To Strengthen Hawaii's Efforts To End Campus-based Sexual Violence And Gender Discrimination.
Title
Convening A Task Force To Address Implementation Of Hawaii's State Law Corollary To Title Ix To Strengthen Hawaii's Efforts To End Campus-based Sexual Violence And Gender Discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1724), recommending referral to JHA. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Ohno, Quinlan. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 04-06-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 476) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1460) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-21 9:50AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Wakai. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 3:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HRE, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR9 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR12 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SR8 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR12 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SR8 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.