HI SCR95 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Departments And Other Agencies Of The State And The City And County Of Honolulu To Designate Government Parking Lots For Use At Night By The Homeless Who Own Vehicles And Sleep In Their Vehicles.
Title
Homelessness; Parking Lot Use at Night
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2011-04-13 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2011-04-13 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2011-04-13 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/PGM/EDT/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-11 11:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Re-Referred to HMS/PGM/EDT/WAM. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Referred to HMS/PGM/EDU/EDT, WAM. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=95 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SCR95_.HTM |