HI SCR95 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR95
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Convene A Working Group To Develop Recommendations For Effective Communications With Limited English Proficient Persons And Persons With Disabilities Before, During, And After Emergencies And Natural Disasters.
Title
Requesting The Governor To Convene A Working Group To Develop Recommendations For Effective Communications With Limited English Proficient Persons And Persons With Disabilities Before, During, And After Emergencies And Natural Disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1740), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, Mizuno, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 04-06-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to PDP, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 517) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1376) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR95 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR121 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HMS.
SR74 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR121 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HMS.
SR74 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.