HI SCR97 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Insurance Commissioner To Convene A Working Group To Explore The Creation Of A Web Services-based Database Program To Track Uninsured Motorists.
Title
Uninsured Motorists; Uninsured Motorists Database; Working Group
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 701). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marumoto voting no (1) and none excused (0). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1819-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Lee, Choy, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Cullen, Giugni, Ward. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-20-12 3:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Takumi excused (2). | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1782-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Cullen, M. Lee, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Luke, Saiki, Takumi. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 04-16-12 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 64 | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 04-16-12 10:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 62 | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 462) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) One Day Notice 04-04-12. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Reported from CPN/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3155) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Solomon, Slom. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-12 8:45AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to CPN/EDT. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) Offered. |