HI SCR97 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR97
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Report Information Relating To Expenditures From The Works Of Art Special Fund For The Curation And Preservation Of Native Hawaiian Art.
Title
Requesting The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Report Information Relating To Expenditures From The Works Of Art Special Fund For The Curation And Preservation Of Native Hawaiian Art.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to LCA. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR97 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 32
HCR119 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - Referred to LCA.
SR87 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA.
HCR119 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - Referred to LCA.
SR87 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=97&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SCR97_.HTM |