HI SR108 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR108
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Counties And The State To Work With Huamakahikina And Kumu Hula To Establish Policies Protecting Hula.
Title
Urging The Counties And The State To Work With Huamakahikina And Kumu Hula To Establish Policies Protecting Hula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3797) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN/LCA. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR108 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR121 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SCR121 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.