HI SR11 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation And City And County Of Honolulu Department Of Planning And Permitting, With Support From The Honolulu Authority For Rapid Transportation, To Conduct A Joint Study Addressing The Demand For Workforce Housing And Transit-oriented Development; And To Create A Development Plan For Workforce Housing Expansion.
Title
Economic Development; Transportation; Workforce Housing, Rail Transit; Joint Study; Development Plan (SD1)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1402) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HSH/TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1018), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, English, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Inouye, Kidani, Slom. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH/TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to HSH/TRA, WAM. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Offered. |