HI SR110 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Hazard Mitigation Forum To Study Measures To Mitigate Risks Associated With State Flood Hazards.
Title
DLNR; Stream Maintenance; Flood Hazard Mitigation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) One Day Notice 04-21-11. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1330) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-11 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to WLH. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |