HI SR110 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR110
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Education To Include Instruction In Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Into Health Education Curriculum For Students In Grades Nine Through Twelve In All Public Schools In The State.
Title
Urging The Board Of Education To Include Instruction In Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Into Health Education Curriculum For Students In Grades Nine Through Twelve In All Public Schools In The State.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-19. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1663) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR110 (Carry Over) 2019-04-01 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=110&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR110_.HTM |