HI SR117 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR117
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Education, Complex Areas, And Charter Schools To Implement School-wide Restorative Justice Practices In The State's Public And Charter Schools.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Education, Complex Areas, And Charter Schools To Implement School-wide Restorative Justice Practices In The State's Public And Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR117 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to EDU.
HR132 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SCR151 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR132 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SCR151 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=117&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SR117_.HTM |