HI SR132 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Professional Chapter Of The Society Of Professional Journalists To Recommend A Process That Individuals Can Utilize To Evaluate And Identify Whether Or Not News Sources Adhere To Ethical And Objective Standards.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Professional Chapter Of The Society Of Professional Journalists To Recommend A Process That Individuals Can Utilize To Evaluate And Identify Whether Or Not News Sources Adhere To Ethical And Objective Standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3579) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR155 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 27