HI SR19 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR19
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands, In Conjunction With The County Of Hawaii Department Of Water Supply, To Provide A Progress Report Regarding The Development Of The Kau Water System.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands, In Conjunction With The County Of Hawaii Department Of Water Supply, To Provide A Progress Report Regarding The Development Of The Kau Water System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-22-21. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1017) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-11-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR19 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR30 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR30 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.