HI SR54 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Access Hawaii Committee, Hawaii Information Consortium, And Each State Agency Who Currently Has A Partnership With The Hawaii Information Consortium To Collaborate And Provide The Legislature With A Comprehensive Progress Report Regarding The Activities And Expenses Of The State's Internet Portal.
Title
State Internet Portal; Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3424) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3202), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-23-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=54&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SR54_.HTM |