HI SR54 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR54
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State Sheriff To Create A Working Group To Develop A Plan For Combating The Illicit Drug Abuse Epidemic In The State.
Title
Urging The State Sheriff To Create A Working Group To Develop A Plan For Combating The Illicit Drug Abuse Epidemic In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1231), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR54 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.