HI SR55 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Report adopted, referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Report adopted, referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Public Safety To Continue And Expand Its Community-based Work Furlough Programs To Assist Formerly Incarcerated Female Inmates Transition Back Into Society.
Title
Transitional programs for incarcerated women.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3273), with recommendation of referral to JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Inouye. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-16 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=55&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SR55_.HTM |