HI SR81 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing Strong Support For The Faculty And Students Of The Classics Division Of The Department Of Languages And Literatures Of Europe And The Americas At The University Of Hawaii At Manoa.
Title
Classics Department; University of Hawaii
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-15. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1329) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kidani, Wakai. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to HEA. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |