HI SR85 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting All High-occupancy State And County Buildings, The Design Of Which Commences On Or After July 1, 2025, To Be Designed And Constructed To Withstand Category Five Hurricanes And To Serve As Shelters In The Event Of An Emergency.
Title
Requesting All High-occupancy State And County Buildings, The Design Of Which Commences On Or After July 1, 2025, To Be Designed And Constructed To Withstand Category Five Hurricanes And To Serve As Shelters In The Event Of An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from GVO/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3630) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Awa. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to GVO/PSM. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR103 (Same As) 2024-04-12 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on WAL as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Evslin, Holt, Woodson excused (4).
Subjects
Construction
County-owned Public Buildings
Design
High-Occupancy Buildings
Hurricanes
Shelter
State-owned Public Buildings
County-owned Public Buildings
Design
High-Occupancy Buildings
Hurricanes
Shelter
State-owned Public Buildings