IA HF2289 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2591.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2591.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to Lyme disease, including notice and consent provisions required for Lyme disease testing, and continuing education requirements for health care providers.(See HF 2591.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to Lyme disease, including notice and consent provisions required for Lyme disease testing, and continuing education requirements for health care providers.(See HF 2591.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2591. |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 270. |
2024-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2024 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Boden, Baeth and Kniff McCulla. H.J. 204. |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 189. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2591 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Amendment H-8166 filed. H.J. 540.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2289 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2289.html |