IA HF2305 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 595.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 595.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of programs by the economic development authority by modifying the high quality jobs program, creating a workforce housing tax incentives program and making penalties applicable, and repealing the enterprise zone program, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 542) (See Cmte. Bill HF 2448)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of programs by the economic development authority by modifying the high quality jobs program, creating a workforce housing tax incentives program and making penalties applicable, and repealing the enterprise zone program, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 542) (See Cmte. Bill HF 2448)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 595. |
2014-03-06 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-03-06 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2014-03-03 | House | Subcommittee, Landon, Thomas, and Vander Linden. H.J. 378. |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 269. |