IA HF2338 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 780.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 780.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to temporary restricted licenses for operating-while-intoxicated offenders, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 619.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to temporary restricted licenses for operating-while-intoxicated offenders, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 619.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 780. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 767. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 886. |
2018-04-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 748. |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 747. |
2018-04-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8315. H.J. 746. |
2018-03-26 | House | Senate amendment H-8315 filed. H.J. 679. |
2018-03-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 675. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 770. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0. S.J. 769. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5158 adopted. S.J. 769. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 753. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Amendment S-5158 filed. S.J. 679. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 679. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Kinney, and Sinclair. S.J. 397. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 379. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 379. |
2018-02-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 307. |
2018-02-19 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 306. |
2018-02-16 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 259. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB619 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2018 9:00AM House Lounge