IA HF2453 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 896.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 896.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for An Act relating to the administration of the historic preservation and cultural and entertainment district tax credit program by the department of cultural affairs, providing for fees, and including applicability provisions. Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for An Act relating to the administration of the historic preservation and cultural and entertainment district tax credit program by the department of cultural affairs, providing for fees, and including applicability provisions. Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 896. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 895. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 830. |
2014-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 785. |
2014-04-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 792. |
2014-04-23 | House | Passed House, ayes 93, nays 2. H.J. 783. |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8287. H.J. 783. |
2014-04-23 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-04-21 | House | Senate amendment H-8287 filed. H.J. 773. |
2014-04-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 771. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 813. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 812. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5165 adopted. S.J. 812. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-5165 filed. S.J. 806. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 806. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Subcommittee, Dotzler, Bertrand, and Bolkcom. S.J. 673. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 654. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 654. |
2014-03-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 600. |
2014-04-01 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 639. |
2014-03-26 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays 2. H.J. 598. |
2014-03-24 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-03-21 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 559. |