IA HF2468 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 897.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 897.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating an individual income tax credit for qualified adoption expenses paid or incurred in connection with certain adoptions and including retroactive applicability provisions. Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act creating an individual income tax credit for qualified adoption expenses paid or incurred in connection with certain adoptions and including retroactive applicability provisions. Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 897. |
2014-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 895. |
2014-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895. |
2014-04-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 824. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 873. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 872. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 826. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Subcommittee, Petersen, Feenstra, and Seng. S.J. 819. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 780. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 780. |
2014-04-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 732. |
2014-04-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 750. |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 1. H.J. 724. |
2014-04-14 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-04-09 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 694. |