IA HF253 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the transfer tax imposed on insurers organized in other states who elect to become domestic insurers in Iowa. (Formerly HSB 52)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the transfer tax imposed on insurers organized in other states who elect to become domestic insurers in Iowa. (Formerly HSB 52)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-31 | Subcommittee, Paustian, Grassley, and Oldson. H.J. 868. | |
2011-02-11 | Referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 318. | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 311. |