IA HF664 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 935.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 935.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting certain leases or rentals between affiliates from the sales and use tax and from the fee for new vehicle registration, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 68.) Effective date: 05/17/2024. Applicability date: 01/01/2015.
Title
A bill for an act exempting certain leases or rentals between affiliates from the sales and use tax and from the fee for new vehicle registration, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 68.) Effective date: 05/17/2024. Applicability date: 01/01/2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 935. |
2024-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 935. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-18 | House | Chief Clerk's report on correction in engrossment H.J. 870. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 866. |
2024-04-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 829. |
2024-04-17 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 824. |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate Amendment H-8312. H.J. 824. |
2024-04-11 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-11 | House | Senate amendment H-8312 filed. H.J. 778. |
2024-04-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 776. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 800. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 799. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5138 filed, adopted. S.J. 799. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Ways and Means calendar. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 742. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2024 2:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Koelker. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Koelker. S.J. 1062. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1008. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1008. |
2023-05-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 950. |
2023-05-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1014. |
2023-05-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 978. |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 941. |
2023-03-30 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-13 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 600. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB68 (Related) 2023-03-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 664.
SSB1204 (Related) 2023-04-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
SSB1204 (Related) 2023-04-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].