IA HSB542 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2130
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2156
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2156
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 133.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 133.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to schools that are required to register with the college student aid commission.(See HF 2156.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to schools that are required to register with the college student aid commission.(See HF 2156.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 133. |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 12:45PM House Lounge. |
2022-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Bossman and Staed. H.J. 88. |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 86. |
2022-01-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3048 (Related) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
SF2130 (Replaced by) 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 813.
HF2156 (Replaced by) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
SF2130 (Replaced by) 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 813.
HF2156 (Replaced by) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB542 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB542.html |