IA HSB651 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2453
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for creating an exemption from the sales tax for certain items directly and primarily used in the production of electricity.
Title
A study bill for creating an exemption from the sales tax for certain items directly and primarily used in the production of electricity.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Voted - Ways and Means. |
2016-03-29 | House | 2:00PM; House Lounge Ways and Means. |
2016-03-23 | House | Ways and Means: Stanerson Chair,Cownie, and Kelley. |
2016-03-23 | House | In Ways and Means |
2016-03-23 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF2453 (Replaced by) 2016-04-11 - Fiscal note. HCS.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB651 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB651.html |