IA SF384 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 638.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 638.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the criminal offense of assault on a pregnant person, and providing penalties.(Formerly SF 223.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the criminal offense of assault on a pregnant person, and providing penalties.(Formerly SF 223.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 638. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | HF 570 substituted. S.J. 637. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3089 filed, adopted. S.J. 637. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Attached to HF 570. S.J. 632. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 396. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 391. |
Same As/Similar To
SF223 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 384. S.J. 396.