IA SF451 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 869.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 869.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the allowable uses for modified allowable growth for programs for returning dropouts and dropout prevention and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 247.) Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the allowable uses for modified allowable growth for programs for returning dropouts and dropout prevention and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 247.) Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 869. | |
2012-04-24 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 856. | |
2012-04-24 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 856. | |
2012-04-10 | Message from Senate. H.J. 777. | |
2012-04-10 | Immediate message. S.J. 758. | |
2012-04-10 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 756. | |
2012-04-10 | Senate concurred with S-5170. S.J. 756. | |
2012-04-10 | Amendment S-5191 filed, lost. S.J. 755. | |
2012-04-06 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2012-04-09 | Deferred. S.J. 747. | |
2012-04-04 | Message from House, with amendment S-5170. S.J. 721. | |
2012-04-04 | Immediate message. H.J. 742. | |
2012-04-04 | Passed House, ayes 92, nays 6. H.J. 741. | |
2012-04-04 | Amendment H-8339 as amended, adopted. H.J. 741. | |
2012-04-04 | Amendment H-8377 out of order. H.J. 741. | |
2012-04-04 | Amendment H-8387 adopted. H.J. 741. | |
2012-04-04 | Amendment H-8368 withdrawn. H.J. 741. | |
2012-04-04 | Committee amendment H-8278 withdrawn. H.J. 740. | |
2012-04-02 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2012-03-29 | Amendment H-8387 filed. H.J. 706. | |
2012-03-29 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2012-03-27 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2012-03-27 | Amendments H-8368 and H-8377 filed. H.J. 671. | |
2012-03-26 | Amendment H-8339 filed. H.J. 644. | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 627. | |
2012-03-15 | Committee amendment H-8278 filed. H.J. 578. | |
2012-03-15 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 574. | |
2012-03-07 | Subcommittee reassigned, Dolecheck, Forristall, and Winckler. H.J. 476. | |
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-15 | Subcommittee, L. Miller, Forristall, and Winckler. H.J. 685. | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 624. | |
2011-03-10 | Message from Senate. H.J. 621. | |
2011-03-10 | Immediate message. S.J. 645. | |
2011-03-10 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 642. | |
2011-03-10 | Amendment S-3081 ruled out of order. S.J. 642. | |
2011-03-10 | Amendment S-3081 filed. S.J. 642. | |
2011-03-10 | Amendment S-3088 filed, adopted. S.J. 641. | |
2011-03-10 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2011-03-07 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 514. | |
2011-03-07 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 506. |