IA SF554 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. [].
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. [].
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefits manager reverse auctions and group insurance, and annual reporting by pharmacy benefits managers. (Formerly SF 284.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefits manager reverse auctions and group insurance, and annual reporting by pharmacy benefits managers. (Formerly SF 284.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. []. |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 12:30PM RM 19. |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Forbes and Young. H.J. 123. |
2024-01-22 | House | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 116. |
2023-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 908. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 934. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 1. S.J. 933. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Amendment S-3120 adopted, as amended. S.J. 933. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Amendment S-3174 to S-3120 filed, adopted. S.J. 933. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Amendment S-3120 filed. S.J. 769. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 723. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 680. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 679. |
Same As/Similar To
SF284 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 554. S.J. 680.