IA SF565 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 937.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 937.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to prior authorization for medication-assisted treatment under the Medicaid program. (Formerly SSB 1231.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to prior authorization for medication-assisted treatment under the Medicaid program. (Formerly SSB 1231.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 937. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | HF 623 substituted. S.J. 936. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 623. S.J. 598. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 524. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 518. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1231 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 11:30AM RM 315.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF565 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF565.html |